U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Chunnui v. Peoria Unified School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.