U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Aguilar v. Thornell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.