U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03695
  • Case Name: January et al v. Schreihans et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.