U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02384-
  • Case Name: Tarrell Reith Fulton and Veronica Ann Fulton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Vacate (Motion to)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.