U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-09494-
  • Case Name: ID ELECTRIC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Objection]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice of Filing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry - Set Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oContinuing/Rescheduling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oVacating Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Report of Ballots]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Continue (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oAttorney or Other Professional Compensation (Application for)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [5Notice of Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.