U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02382
  • Case Name: RICKY GIBSON MADDUX and KARLA ELAINE MADDUX
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [oRelief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.