U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-02381-
  • Case Name: JOSEPH DOUGLAS MYERS and KATHLEEN MYERS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Employ (Application to)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.