U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01268-PS
  • Case Name: Hugo Mauricio Carias and Heidi Carias
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded (batch)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oMMM Form 03 - Motion for Referral to Mortgage Modification Mediation Program]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [MMM Form 02 - Referral to Mortgage Modification Mediation Program (Motion for)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oReinstating Case]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.