U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02402-
  • Case Name: Danielle Lee Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Filing Fee Paid--Amendment]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Regarding Electronic Submission (eSR only)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.