U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10906-
  • Case Name: SHRITA DENISE CRITTLE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.