U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02400-
  • Case Name: CARLA T THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.