U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-ap-00248-
  • Case Name: Perfection Granite Co., LLC v. Signature Mechanical
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [audio]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oContinuing/Rescheduling]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry - Set Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.