U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02395-
  • Case Name: HUGO ALBERTO MEJIA and MARYZA MUNOZ DIAZ-MEJIA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.