U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-01298-
  • Case Name: CHARITY TOWING AND RECOVERY, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Attorney or Other Professional Compensation (Application for)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Entry (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice of Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oFile Chapter 11 Sub V Post-Confirmation Reports (MCW) (Form)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oConfirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [CHAP Minute Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.