U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10288-
  • Case Name: ANTONETTE RINO CALMA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.