U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02390-
  • Case Name: SHEKA TAYETTA HILL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice of Filing Bankruptcy]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.