U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02389-
  • Case Name: LUIS MORENO-BRUNO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.