U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02416
  • Case Name: JOHN C GILMORE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors Held]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Change of Address]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.