U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02413-
  • Case Name: JEFFREY S STEWART and TAYLOR A STEWART
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1 CREDITOR - Notice of Appearance/Request for Notice (batch) (document required)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Reaffirmation Agreement and Motion to Approve - Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oReinstating Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.