U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10015-
  • Case Name: LISA BETH REED
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oRelief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.