U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01905-
  • Case Name: ROBERT T. BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oReinstating Case]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Reinstatement (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.