U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-00283-
  • Case Name: ALBERT R. SHELTON and ISABEL GONZALEZ-AMBRIZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [audio]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.