U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11026-
  • Case Name: PAUL MICHAEL USHER and CARRIE ANN TRACY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.