U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00258-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL ANTHONY BUTLER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim (Motion to)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Minutes of 341 Meeting]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Periodic Report Regarding Entities in Which the Debtor Holds a Controlling Interest]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Pre-Status Conference Report]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Filing Fee Paid--Conversion]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Final Report - Converted/Transferred Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oGranting]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice of Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [audio]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [audio]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oPay Conversion to Chapter 11 Filing Fee (Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oPay Conversion to Chapter 11 Filing Fee (Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oConverting Case to Chapter 11]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.