U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-00029-
  • Case Name: DARRIN BOND and MICHELLE BOND
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [o~Generic~ Order]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Settlement (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.