U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01458-
  • Case Name: JAMES DANIEL MCCREARY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.