U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02404-
  • Case Name: DOUGLAS WAYNE BAKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro Se Debtor]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Reaffirmation Agreement and Motion to Approve - Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Correspondence]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.