U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00202-PS
  • Case Name: CHARLIE MICHAEL CANO, JR.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [No Objection (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.