U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02439
  • Case Name: Kevin Jamall Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.