U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-ap-00027-
  • Case Name: INNOVATIVE CONCEPTS EMPIRE, LLC v. NEWCO CAPITAL GROUP, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Transcript and Notice of Filing (Form)]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [CHAP Minute Entry]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [audio]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form (Adv & Misc)]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [audio]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 13, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing (Adversary/Misc Proceeding) - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Declaration]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.