U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02435
  • Case Name: DREW MICHAEL JONES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.