U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02432-
  • Case Name: DESIREE DIAZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.