U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02428
  • Case Name: SHEREE M ANDERSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oRelief from Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [No Objection (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.