U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02426
  • Case Name: BRYAN CHRISTOPHER MCCULLOCH and CLARA ANNETTE MCCULLOCH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.