U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-07457-
  • Case Name: RICHARD HAROLD CORLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oConfirming Chapter 13/12 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oAllowing Payment of Chapter 13 Attorney Fees]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.