U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02423-
  • Case Name: Elgin Warren Avila
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Converted to Chapter 13 and Notice of Conversion]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oConverting Case to Chapter 7, 12 or 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Convert Chapter 7 or 11 Case to Chapter 13 (Motion to)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Convert Chapter 7 or 11 Case to Chapter 13 (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.