U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-02099-
  • Case Name: Dwight David Faught
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [audio]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [CHAP Minute Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [audio]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oMinute Entry Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [audio]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.