U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02445-
  • Case Name: SARRETTA N. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [No Objection (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1 CREDITOR - Notice of Appearance/Request for Notice (batch) (document required)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.