U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08063
  • Case Name: Scott v. Purkey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 21, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.