U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02451-
  • Case Name: JASMINE G SANCHEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Deficiency Memo (Non QC for ProSe Form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.