U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00098-PS
  • Case Name: SANDERS v. ESPINOZA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oVacating Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve (Motion to)]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [audio]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oDenying]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oSetting Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.