U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02450-
  • Case Name: DAVID C. SATTERLEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.