U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-01566-
  • Case Name: Esquivel Chicano Trucking, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - minimal funds collected]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oPay Unclaimed Funds to Court]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Receipt for Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oGranting]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.