U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02449
  • Case Name: JOSEPH WOO LEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice of Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Redemption of Personal Property (Motion for)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.