U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10550-
  • Case Name: CHRISTOPHER DAVID ARAPIAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [2004 Examination (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oFRBP 2004 Examination (Application for)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [FRBP 2004 Examination (Application for)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.