U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00068-
  • Case Name: Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee v. Alliance Medical Administration, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oConsolidate Adversary Proceedings]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.