U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02462-
  • Case Name: ROBERT L JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.