U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-03393-
  • Case Name: AMIE LYN ERICKSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Continued Hearing (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry - Set Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Continued Hearing (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oContinue]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry - Set Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Continue (Motion to)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oWithdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oFRBP 2004 Examination (Application for)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [FRBP 2004 Examination (Application for)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Hearing on Motion (Notice of)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.