U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-02362-
  • Case Name: ROSALIE A MASHTALIER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Change in Conduit Payment]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oReinstating Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Vacate (Motion to)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.