U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02458-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL ALAN CINQUINI and STEPHANIE MICHELLE CINQUINI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.